MT SB358 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise tax increment financing districts
Title
Generally revise tax increment financing districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress | |
2011-05-13 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared | |
2011-05-13 | (S) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-04 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-11 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-03-29 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-03-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-19 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-15 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |