MT SB385 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise landlord tenant laws
Title
Generally revise landlord tenant laws
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |