MT SB410 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for tax credits for contributions to public and private schools
Title
Provide for tax credits for contributions to public and private schools
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Legislature
Revenue, State
Rule Making
School Finance
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
Revenue, State
Rule Making
School Finance
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income