MT SB49 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise license laws for hunting/fishing by nonresident relatives of residents
Title
Revise license laws for hunting/fishing by nonresident relatives of residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) Fish and Game |
2017-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Fish and Game |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2016-12-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-06 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-09-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=49&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/sb0099/SB0049_1.pdf |