MT SB510 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Abatement of half of coal gross proceeds tax for new underground mine
Title
Abatement of half of coal gross proceeds tax for new underground mine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Motion Carried   | |
2009-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) On Motion Rules Suspended   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Motion Failed   | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-01 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-04-01 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-03-28 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-03-28 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-03-27 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-03-23 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-03-23 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-16 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-03-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-03-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-03-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=510&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |