MT SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise captive insurance laws
Title
Generally revise captive insurance laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-04-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2018-12-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-12-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |