MT SB65 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Revise trust land funding laws
Title
Revise trust land funding laws
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hawks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-04-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-04-09 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House   | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-08 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments   | |
2009-04-07 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-06 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-03 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-04-02 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-29 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-01-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-01-27 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-01-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-01-08 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-07 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-06 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-05 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-01-02 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2008-12-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2008-12-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-10 | (S) Introduced   | |
2008-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent   | |
2008-12-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-12-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]   | |
2008-11-24 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-11-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-11-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-11-20 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-11-10 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-09-26 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-07-16 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=65&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |