MT SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise drug and alcohol laws
Title
Generally revise drug and alcohol laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-23 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-12-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-07-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |