NC H100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Ch. SL 2019-231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Ch. SL 2019-231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
DOT Budget for 2019-2021 Biennium
Title
DOT Budget for 2019-2021 Biennium
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] |
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Ch. SL 2019-231 | |
2019-10-18 | Signed by Gov. 10/18/2019 | |
2019-10-11 | Pres. To Gov. 10/11/2019 | |
2019-10-10 | Ratified | |
2019-10-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-09 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/09/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/08/2019 |
2019-10-07 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-10-03 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-14 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/13/2019 |
2019-03-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |