NC H1002 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-16 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-16 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Use of CAM Systems
Title
Expand Use of CAM Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - A1 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - A1 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2019-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Filed |