NC H101 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special License Plate Development Process
Title
Special License Plate Development Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Ch. SL 2014-96 | |
2014-08-01 | Signed by Gov. 8/1/2014 | |
2014-07-28 | Pres. To Gov. 7/28/2014 | |
2014-07-25 | Ratified | |
2014-07-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-25 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-07-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-24 | House | Reptd Fav To Concur |
2014-07-23 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-07-17 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-02-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-02-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-14 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S114 (Same As) 2013-02-21 - Ref To Com On Finance