NC H1017 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Ch. SL 2019-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Special Master Wake House Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Master Wake House Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Ch. SL 2019-46
2019-06-25 Ratified
2019-06-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-14SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-13HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-04HouseRef To Com On Redistricting
2019-06-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-04HouseRules Suspended
2019-06-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback