NC H1021 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Justice Reinvestment Clarifications
Title
Justice Reinvestment Clarifications
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Stam [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Ch. SL 2012-188 | |
2012-07-16 | Signed By Gov. 7/16/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2012-06-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2012-06-26 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2012-06-26 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-11 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-22 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2012-05-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-21 | Filed |