NC H1023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Relief Fund/Additions & Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Relief Fund/Additions & Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A2 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A3 Graham Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A4 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A5 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - A7 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-80
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-25 Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
2020-06-25 Ratified
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2020
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-24HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-24SenateEngrossed
2020-06-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24SenateAmend Tabled A6
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A5
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A4
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A3
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-23SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-22SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-31SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-10-31HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-30HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-10-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A7
2019-10-30HouseAmendment Withdrawn A6
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A5
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-10-30HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-10-30HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-22HouseRef To Com On Appropriations
2019-10-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-22HouseRules Suspended
2019-10-22HouseFiled
2019-10-22HouseReptd Fav. For Introduction

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H1023
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1023v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/883
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/882
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/881
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/880
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/879
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/878
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/877
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/835
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/834
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/833
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/832
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/831
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/830
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/829
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1041

Bill Comments

feedback