NC H1025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Ch. SL 2018-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Ch. SL 2018-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
GSC Technical Corrections 2018
Title
GSC Technical Corrections 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Ch. SL 2018-142 | |
2018-12-14 | Signed by Gov. 12/14/2018 | |
2018-12-06 | Pres. To Gov. 12/6/2018 | |
2018-12-05 | Ratified | |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-05-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Filed |