NC H1029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Ch. SL 2018-146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Ch. SL 2018-146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bipartisan State Board Changes
Title
Bipartisan State Board Changes
Sponsors
Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-27 - House - M4 Previous Question Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-27 - House - Veto Override (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-27 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 and 2 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A3 Torbett Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A4 Jones, Bert Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A5 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - A6 Bradford Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - A1 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - A2 Beasley Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-12-27 - House - Veto Override (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-27 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 and 2 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A3 Torbett Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A4 Jones, Bert Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A5 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - A6 Bradford Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - A1 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - A2 Beasley Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-27 | Ch. SL 2018-146 | |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Veto Received from the House |
2018-12-27 | House | Veto Overridden |
2018-12-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/27/2018 |
2018-12-21 | House | Received from the Governor |
2018-12-21 | Vetoed 12/21/2018 | |
2018-12-12 | Pres. To Gov. 12/12/2018 | |
2018-12-12 | Ratified | |
2018-12-12 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Conf Rept #2 Place on Calendar |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Conf Rept Withdrawn |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-12-12 | House | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-12-12 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2018-12-12 | House | Conf Rpt Withdrawn |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Conf Com #2 Reported |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/12/2018 |
2018-12-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-11 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2018-12-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-12-11 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2018-12-11 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-12-10 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-12-10 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-14 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-14 | House | Fail Concur In S Amend 2 |
2018-06-14 | House | Fail Concur In S Amend SA1 |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-12 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2018-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-30 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Filed |