NC H104 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Vetoed 9/10/2009
Status: Vetoed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Vetoed 9/10/2009
Summary
Clarify Legislative Confidentiality.
Title
Clarify Legislative Confidentiality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Vetoed 9/10/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-10 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-08-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-07-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-03-05 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Placed On Cal For 3/4/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-26 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-11 | Ref to the Com on Ethics, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-02-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S136 (Same As) 2011-02-28 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H104 |