NC H1048 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
AG Selection Criteria/NCNG Amendments
Title
AG Selection Criteria/NCNG Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-07-02 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - A1 Whitmire Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-07-02 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - A1 Whitmire Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-106 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2014 | |
2014-07-30 | Ratified | |
2014-07-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2014 |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-25 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2014 |
2014-07-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-16 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2014-07-16 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-07-16 | House | Conf Report Failed |
2014-07-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-16 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-03 | House | Fail To Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-02 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-02 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-02 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2013-06-04 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S760 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I