NC H1051 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Ch. Res 2020-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Ch. Res 2020-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Linda Johnson
Title
Honor Linda Johnson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Ch. Res 2020-4 |
2020-06-23 | Ratified | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-22 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2020 |
2020-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Filed |