NC H1052 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mechanics Liens/Payment Bond Reforms
Title
Mechanics Liens/Payment Bond Reforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-175 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-27 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2012-06-18 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-23 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2012-05-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S864 (Same As) 2012-05-23 - Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance