NC H106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Inmate Health Care & 340B Program
Title
Inmate Health Care & 340B Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Ch. SL 2019-135 | |
2019-07-19 | Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2019 | |
2019-07-09 | Ratified | |
2019-07-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-08 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-07-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-04 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-02 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety Added |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Health and Human Services Stricken |
2019-03-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-03-27 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Health and Human Services Added |
2019-03-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S119 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate