NC H1070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Grants for Certain Milk Producers
Title
Emergency Grants for Certain Milk Producers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2020 |
2020-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2020 |
2020-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-11 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S713 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate