NC H108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

PED/Safekeeper Health Care Cost Recov. Pract

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PED/Safekeeper Health Care Cost Recov. Pract

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26 Ch. SL 2019-171
2019-07-26 Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019
2019-07-16 Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2019
2019-07-15 Ratified
2019-07-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-11HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-07-10HousePlaced On Cal For 07/11/2019
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-07-10SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-10SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-02SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-20HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S118 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H108
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H108v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/230
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/467
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/466
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/646

Bill Comments

feedback