NC H1080 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Achievement School District
Title
Achievement School District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 66 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Ch. SL 2016-110 | |
2016-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-28 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn A8 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amend Recon A8 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A9 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A8 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A7 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Failed A5 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A6 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Tabled A4 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Tabled A3 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-06-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/02/2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2016-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-11 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Filed |