NC H1082 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
ABC Admin. Penalties/Alcohol Consumables
Title
ABC Admin. Penalties/Alcohol Consumables
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2020-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Filed |