NC H1085 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Health Plan/Statutory Changes.-AB
Title
State Health Plan/Statutory Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A1 Dollar\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A1 Dollar\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-173 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-13 | Ref To Com On Insurance | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-12 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/12/2012 | |
2012-06-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-11 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-24 | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Finance | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |