NC H1099 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clarify Effective Date for SEPA Exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify Effective Date for SEPA Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-03 Ch. SL 2010-188
2010-08-03 Signed By Gov. 8/3/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-09 Conf Report Adopted
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Conf Com Reported
2010-07-09 Conf Report Adopted
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Conf Com Reported
2010-07-09 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-09 Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi
2010-07-09 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-09 Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi
2010-07-08 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-08 Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi
2010-07-08 Conf Com Appointed
2010-07-08 Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi
2009-08-06 Conf Com Appointed
2009-08-06 Conf Com Appointed
2009-08-06 Failed Concur In Com Sub
2009-08-06 Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009
2009-08-06 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-08-06 Rec To Concur S Com Sub
2009-08-05 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-08-05 Amend Adopted #4
2009-08-05 Amend Adopted #3
2009-08-05 Amend Adopted #2
2009-08-05 Amend Adopted #1
2009-08-04 Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009
2009-08-04 Withdrawn From Com
2009-08-04 Re-ref Com On Finance
2009-08-04 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-08-04 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-19 Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2009-05-14 Rec From House
2009-05-14 Passed 3rd Reading
2009-05-13 Passed 2nd Reading
2009-05-12 Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009
2009-05-12 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-05-12 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2009-05-07 Re-ref Com On Finance
2009-05-07 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-04-07 Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Finance
2009-04-07 Passed 1st Reading
2009-04-06 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1099&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1099v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1066
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1067
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1068
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1069
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1070
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1605

Bill Comments

feedback