NC H1105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Ch. SL 2020-97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Relief Act 3.0

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Relief Act 3.0

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 7 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 9 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Amendment 12 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-04 Ch. SL 2020-97
2020-09-04 Signed by Gov. 9/4/2020
2020-09-03 Pres. To Gov. 9/3/2020
2020-09-03 Ratified
2020-09-03HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-09-03HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-09-02HousePlaced On Cal For 09/03/2020
2020-09-02HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-09-02HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-09-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-09-02SenateEngrossed
2020-09-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-09-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A12
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A11
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A10
2020-09-02SenateAmend Tabled A9
2020-09-02SenateAmend Tabled A8
2020-09-02SenateAmend Tabled A7
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A6
2020-09-02SenateAmendment Ruled Out-of-Order A5
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A4
2020-09-02SenateAmendment Withdrawn A3
2020-09-02SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-09-02SenateAmend Tabled A1
2020-09-02SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-09-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-09-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-09-02SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2020-09-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-23SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-23SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-23SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2020-06-23HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-22HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-22HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2020
2020-06-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-18HouseReptd Fav
2020-06-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-05-14HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-05-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H1105
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H1105v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/981
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/908
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/907
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/906
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/905
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/904
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/903
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/902
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/901
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/900
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/899
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/898
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1092

Bill Comments

feedback