NC H1108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Ch. SL 2018-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Ch. SL 2018-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PED/Inmate Pharmacy Purchasing/Monitoring
Title
PED/Inmate Pharmacy Purchasing/Monitoring
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Ch. SL 2018-143 | |
2018-12-14 | Signed by Gov. 12/14/2018 | |
2018-12-06 | Pres. To Gov. 12/6/2018 | |
2018-12-06 | Ratified | |
2018-12-06 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-06 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-04 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-12-04 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-11-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-11-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-11-29 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Filed |