NC H1109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Macon/Clay/No Right-of-Way Spotlighting
Title
Macon/Clay/No Right-of-Way Spotlighting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-12-04 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-29 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Filed |