NC H1111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Ch. SL 2018-139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Ch. SL 2018-139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Additions & Corrections to 2018 Appointments
Title
Additions & Corrections to 2018 Appointments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Ch. SL 2018-139 | |
2018-12-04 | Ratified | |
2018-12-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-04 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-12-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-03 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-11-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Filed |
2018-11-28 | House | Reptd Fav. For Introduction |