NC H1115 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Electronic Parole Notification
Title
Allow Electronic Parole Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-107 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-06 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-14 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |