NC H1136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designation of Uses of Campaign Funds
Title
Designation of Uses of Campaign Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-100 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Ethics, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |