NC H1140 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Educ. Assistance for Minimum Wage Workers
Title
Educ. Assistance for Minimum Wage Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-08-03 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-07-30 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/30/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-12 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |