NC H1143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military Wartime Veteran Special Plate Change
Title
Military Wartime Veteran Special Plate Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-39 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Transportation | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S298 (Same As) 2009-02-25 - Ref To Com On Finance