NC H1166 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-566
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-566
Summary
Insurance Law Changes.-AB
Title
Insurance Law Changes.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-566 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-08-04 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-28 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-07-27 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-23 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1166 |