NC H1173 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absconding Prob. Violators Forfeit Benefits
Title
Absconding Prob. Violators Forfeit Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A3 Floyd\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A2 Haire\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A1 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A3 Floyd\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A2 Haire\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A1 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-170 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-21 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-18 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-30 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee C, if favorable, Finance | |
2012-05-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-29 | Filed |