NC H118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Ch. SL 2020-89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Liab. Safe Harbor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Liab. Safe Harbor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Ch. SL 2020-89
2020-07-02 Signed by Gov. 7/2/2020
2020-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2020
2020-06-24 Ratified
2020-06-23HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-23HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-19HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-19HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-19SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-09SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 4
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H118
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H118v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/409
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/763
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/987

Bill Comments

feedback