NC H1195 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ch. SL 2014-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ch. SL 2014-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fiscal Integrity/Pension-Spiking Prevention
Title
Fiscal Integrity/Pension-Spiking Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Ch. SL 2014-88 | |
2014-07-30 | Signed by Gov. 7/30/2014 | |
2014-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2014 | |
2014-07-23 | Ratified | |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2014 |
2014-06-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2014-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-22 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Appropriations |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Filed |