NC H120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify Fire District Funding Eligibility

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify Fire District Funding Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2019
2019-04-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-21HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-21HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback