NC H1201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local Meat Processors Grants/Marketing Funds
Title
Local Meat Processors Grants/Marketing Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - A3 Dixon Third Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - A1 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - A2 Hunt Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - A1 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - A2 Hunt Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2020-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-23 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2020-06-23 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2020 |
2020-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2020-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-26 | House | Filed |