NC H1218 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Monroe Attorney/Cabarrus Comm
Title
Monroe Attorney/Cabarrus Comm
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Ch. SL 2014-92 | |
2014-08-01 | Ratified | |
2014-07-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-02 | Senate | House Fail to Concur - Senate Appoint Conferees Message Sent To House |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-01 | House | Fail To Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-01 | House | Fail Concur In S Amend SA1 |
2014-06-30 | House | Postponed To 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2014 |
2014-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2014-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S844 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government