NC H1231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Sidney Locks, Jr., Former Member
Title
Honor Sidney Locks, Jr., Former Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2020 |
2020-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2020-06-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Filed |