NC H124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-19)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Start Funds
Title
Smart Start Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
S427 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
S427 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H124 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H124v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H124v1.pdf |