NC H1249 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Homebuilder Property Tax Deferral Change
Title
Homebuilder Property Tax Deferral Change
Sponsors
Rep. Lorene Coates [D] | Rep. Bob England [D] | Rep. Ty Harrell [D] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Wil Neumann [R] | Rep. Randy Stewart [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-140 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-06-29 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-06-28 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-06-28 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Unfav For Conc | |
2010-06-07 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Commerce | |
2010-05-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |