NC H126 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ch. SL 2019-210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Pay Increases/State Highway Patrol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pay Increases/State Highway Patrol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Ch. SL 2019-210
2019-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-28 Ratified
2019-08-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-28HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-27HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-08-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/27/2019
2019-08-26SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-26HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-08-26HouseRule 44b
2019-08-26HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-20SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-08-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-08-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-29HouseRef To Com On Health
2019-07-25HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-25SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-07-24SenateEngrossed
2019-07-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-23SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-07-23SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-15SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-15SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-15SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-10SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-11HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2019
2019-04-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On Transportation
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S210 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-143

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H126
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H126v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/163
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/518
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/517
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/516
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/527
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/762
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/571
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/795

Bill Comments

feedback