NC H1276 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Ch. Res 2014-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Ch. Res 2014-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adjournment
Title
Adjournment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-20 | Ch. Res 2014-8 | |
2014-08-20 | Ratified | |
2014-08-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-20 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-08-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/15/2014 |
2014-08-14 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-08-14 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-08-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-08-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-08-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-08-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-08-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-08-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed |