NC H1292 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-10 - Ch. SL 2010-196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Univ. Energy Savings/LEA Operational Leases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Univ. Energy Savings/LEA Operational Leases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading\After Reconsid\eration (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 6\To Reconsider (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 3 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-10 Ch. SL 2010-196
2010-08-10 Became Law w/o Signature
2010-07-09 Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Ratified
2010-07-08 Concurred in S/Com Sub 2
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Withdrawn From Com
2010-07-07 Re-ref Com On Appropriations
2010-07-07 Reptd Fav To Concur
2010-07-01 Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Appropriations
2010-07-01 Rec To Concur S Com Sub 2
2010-07-01 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-06-30 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-30 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-12 Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
2010-05-12 Withdrawn From Cal
2009-08-07 Placed On Cal For 5/19/2010
2009-08-07 Withdrawn From Cal
2009-08-06 Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009
2009-08-06 Withdrawn From Cal
2009-08-06 Passed 2nd Reading
2009-08-06 Reconsidered 2nd Reading
2009-08-06 Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009
2009-08-06 Withdrawn From Cal
2009-08-06 Passed 2nd Reading
2009-08-06 Amend Failed #1
2009-08-05 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-08-05 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-20 Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
2009-05-14 Rec From House
2009-05-14 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-13 Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009
2009-05-13 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-05-13 Reptd Fav
2009-05-13 Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
2009-05-13 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-04-09 Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary I
2009-04-09 Passed 1st Reading
2009-04-08 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1292&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H1292v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1112
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1113
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1129
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1130
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1445

Bill Comments

feedback