NC H130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Ch. SL 2019-13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Game Nights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Game Nights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 95 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Ch. SL 2019-13
2019-05-10 Signed by Gov. 5/10/2019
2019-05-01 Pres. To Gov. 5/1/2019
2019-04-30 Ratified
2019-04-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-29HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-04-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenateEngrossed
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-03-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-02-27HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-27HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-02-25HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S66 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H130
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v8.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H130v9.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/87
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/114
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/113
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/229

Bill Comments

feedback