NC H1307 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
No Felon as Sheriff
Title
No Felon as Sheriff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-49 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary III | |
2010-06-24 | Com Sub Ruled Material | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |